Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mandalay

Archidioecesis Mandalayensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Nicholas Mang Thang, Archbishop
  • Paul Zingtung Grawng, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 1 January 1955
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Myanmar
  • Square Kilometers: 212,407 (82,042 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.mandalayarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: 82nd and 25th Street, Mandalay 05071, Myanmar
  • Telephone: (02)36.369

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Burma {Centrale}
27 November 1866ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Central Burma {Centrale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Burma {Birmania Meridio-Occid.} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}
19 July 1870Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Burma {Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale}
5 January 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale} Prefecture Apostolic of Bhamo (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Mandalay
5 January 1939Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Burma {Birmania Settentrionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Mandalay
Archdiocese of Mandalay
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mandalay Archdiocese of Mandalay
21 November 1992Territory LostArchdiocese of Mandalay Diocese of Hakha (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mandalay
195014,0005,000,000.3%38644318209722ap1951
Archdiocese of Mandalay
197035,3775,700,000.6%305351,01098635ap1971
198057,0006,130,000.9%245291,9658895ap1981
199070,22611,260,000.6%503531,3251211615ap1991
199922,00017,000,000.1%296356282314319ap2000
200023,80717,000,000.1%31637643369119ap2001
200121,68115,000,000.1%25631699299920ap2002
200222,80915,000,000.2%25631735849020ap2003
200323,11915,000,000.2%31637624258423ap2004
200422,51115,000,000.2%408484682512630ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Apr 2014