Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aloysius Moses U Ba Khim

Deceased

Archbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1907Born
24 Oct 193729.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Aug 196557.6AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
21 Nov 196557.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
10 Oct 197870.8DiedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Moses U Ba Khim
Archbishop Aloysius Moses U Ba Khim (born , died ) Archbishop of Mandalay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChaung-yo

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017