Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Zingtung Grawng

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay, Myanmar


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1938Born
27 Mar 196527.0Ordained PriestPriest of Myitkyina, Myanmar
24 Jan 197637.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
24 Jan 197637.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
3 Apr 197638.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rusguniae
9 Dec 197638.7AppointedBishop of Myitkyina, Myanmar
15 May 200365.1AppointedArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
3 Apr 201476.0RetiredArchbishop of Mandalay, Myanmar
24 Oct 202082.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mandalay, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Paul Zingtung Grawng
Archbishop Paul Zingtung Grawng (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mandalay

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLunghkat
Ordained BishopOpen Air, Myitkyina, Diocese of Myitkyina
Death PlaceMandalay, Archdiocese of Mandalay

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Apr 2014
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,148
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,197
  • d: CB, 24 Oct 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 24 Oct 2020

Quantcast