Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Gabriel

Deceased

Bishop of Pathein


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1938BornBassein
9 Apr 196426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bassein, Myanmar
30 Jan 198850.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bassein, Myanmar
30 Jan 198850.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
27 Apr 198850.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arae in Numidia
7 Dec 198951.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bassein, Myanmar
22 Feb 199254.0SucceededBishop of Pathein, Myanmar
16 Aug 199456.5DiedBishop of Pathein, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for John Gabriel:
Bishop John Gabriel (born , died ) Bishop of Pathein

  • a priest for 30.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,554
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,754
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 3 Apr 2014