Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Challiol

Deceased

Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1872BornAlbi
31 May 189624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
15 May 192553.1AppointedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
10 Aug 192553.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
25 Aug 192553.4InstalledBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France
11 Mar 194875.9DiedBishop of Rodez (-Vabres), France

MicroData Summary for Charles Challiol:
Bishop Charles Challiol (born , died ) Bishop of Rodez (-Vabres)

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015