Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Clément-Emile Cardinal Roques

Deceased

Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1880BornGraulhet
2 Apr 190423.3Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 192948.4AppointedBishop of Montauban, France
24 Jun 192948.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montauban, France
24 Dec 193454.0AppointedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
11 May 194059.4AppointedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France
18 Feb 194665.2Elevated to Cardinal
18 Feb 194665.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
4 Sep 196483.7DiedArchbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo), France

MicroData Summary for Clément-Emile Roques:
Cardinal Clément-Emile Roques (born , died ) Archbishop of Rennes (-Dol-Saint-Malo)

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 35.2 years
  • a cardinal for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013