Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène-Marie Ernoult

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1926BornSaint-Pol-de-Léon
29 Jun 195124.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Dec 196842.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Nantes, France
23 Dec 196842.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tadamata
6 Jan 196942.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tadamata
9 Sep 197548.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
9 Sep 197548.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tadamata
28 Jun 197750.6SucceededArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
21 Dec 199064.1ResignedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France
2 Sep 199669.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Marie Ernoult:
Archbishop Eugène-Marie Ernoult (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013