Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ernesto Cardinal Civardi

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Bishops

Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1906BornFossarmato
29 Jun 193023.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pavia, Italy
17 May 196760.5AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
26 Jun 196760.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
16 Jul 196760.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
30 Jun 197972.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
30 Jun 197972.6Elevated to Cardinal
30 Jun 197972.6ResignedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
28 Nov 198983.1DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation for Bishops

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Civardi:
Ernesto Cardinal Civardi (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Bishops

  • a priest for 59.4 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
  • a cardinal for 10.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015