Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adhemar Esquivel Kohenque

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1929Born
30 Oct 196031.5Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 196839.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
11 Nov 196839.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caere
6 Jan 196939.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caere
10 Nov 199263.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Tarija, Bolivia
20 Oct 199566.4SucceededBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
2 Jun 200475.1RetiredBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
17 Jul 201384.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Adhemar Esquivel Kohenque
Bishop Adhemar Esquivel Kohenque (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarija

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCampolican

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 44.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 18 Jul 2013
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018