Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolás Renán Aguilera Arroyo

Bishop of Potosí, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1972 Born
8 Dec 199927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tarija, Bolivia
28 Oct 202048.4AppointedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
20 Jan 202148.6Ordained BishopBishop of Potosí, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Renán Aguilera Arroyo
Bishop Nicolás Renán Aguilera Arroyo (born ) Bishop of Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo, Diocese of Tarija
Ordained BishopCathedral, Potosí, Diocese of Potosí

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Potosí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 29 Oct 2020
  • c2: CB, 15 Jan 2021
  • c1: CB, 17 Jan 2021
  • c2+: CB, 19 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 20 Jan 2021

Quantcast