Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Ángel Saldías Pedraza, O.P.

Bishop of Tarija, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1968 Born
25 May 200132.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
25 Mar 201445.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Paz, Bolivia
25 Mar 201445.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Phelbes
5 Jun 201445.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phelbes
11 Oct 201951.1AppointedBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
12 Dec 201951.3InstalledBishop of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Ángel Saldías Pedraza
Bishop Jorge Ángel Saldías Pedraza O.P. (born ) Bishop of Tarija

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuena Vista-La Arboleda, Archdiocese of Santa Cruz de la Sierra
Ordained BishopCathedral, La Paz, Archdiocese of La Paz

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarija.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Mar 2014
  • ob: CB, 4 Apr 2014
  • c2: CB, 29 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 5 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,179
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019
  • i: CB, 13 Nov 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast