Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio Antonio Reimann Panic, O.F.M.

Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

Titular Bishop of Saia Maior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1952 BornKadlub Turowski, Poland
2 Feb 197926.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
31 Oct 200149.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez, Bolivia
31 Oct 200149.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Saia Maior
1 Dec 200149.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Saia Maior

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Antonio Reimann Panic:
Bishop Bonifacio Antonio Reimann Panic O.F.M. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 165, Number 14,080

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013