Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jesús Gervasio Pérez Rodríguez, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jun 1936 BornTamaraceite, Spain
29 Jun 196226.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
14 Jun 198548.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
14 Jun 198548.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lilybaeum
8 Sep 198549.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lilybaeum
6 Nov 198953.3AppointedArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia
2 Feb 201376.6RetiredArchbishop of Sucre, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Jesús Gervasio Pérez Rodríguez:
Archbishop Jesús Gervasio Pérez Rodríguez O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Sucre

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Sucre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2013
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Espańol, Volume 1868, Page 148, Number 581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015