Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Javier Del Río Sendino

Bishop Emeritus of Tarija, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1942 Born
29 Jun 196523.4Ordained PriestPriest of Palencia, Spain
10 Jan 200663.9AppointedBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
30 Mar 200664.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
11 Oct 201977.7RetiredBishop of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Javier Del Río Sendino
Bishop Francisco Javier Del Río Sendino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tarija

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalencia, Diocese of Palencia, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Bernardo, Cathedral, Tarija, Diocese of Tarija

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tarija.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,105
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 11 Oct 2019

Quantcast