Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Eduardo José Bittschi Mayer

Auxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia

Titular Bishop of Nigizubi


Motto: Pax Vobis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1950 Born
21 Nov 197625.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Jun 197726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Eichstätt, Germany
15 May 200857.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
15 May 200857.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Nigizubi
8 Aug 200857.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nigizubi

MicroData Summary
Adolfo Eduardo José Bittschi Mayer
Bishop Adolfo Eduardo José Bittschi Mayer
(born )
Auxiliary Bishop of Sucre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIngolstadt, Diocese of Eichstätt, Germany
Ordained DeaconDiocese of Eichstätt, Germany
Ordained PriestCathedral, Eichstätt, Diocese of Eichstätt, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sucre, Archdiocese of Sucre

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Sucre.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,944

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.2, 10 May 2025; Data: 12 May 2025