Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Luciano Suriani

Apostolic Nuncio to Serbia

Titular Archbishop of Amiternum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1957 BornAtessa, Italy
5 Aug 198124.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chieti-Vasto, Italy
22 Feb 200851.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
22 Feb 200851.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
26 Apr 200851.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amiternum
21 Nov 200851.8ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
24 Sep 200952.7AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
7 Dec 201558.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Serbia

MicroData Summary for Luciano Suriani:
Archbishop Luciano Suriani (born ) Apostolic Nuncio of Serbia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Serbia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,731
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2009
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 7 Dec 2015