Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bruno Forte

Archbishop of Chieti-Vasto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1949 BornNapoli
18 Apr 197323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
26 Jun 200454.9AppointedArchbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy
8 Sep 200455.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy
25 Sep 200455.1InstalledArchbishop of Chieti-Vasto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bruno Forte:
Archbishop Bruno Forte (born ) Archbishop of Chieti-Vasto

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Chieti-Vasto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 May 2014