Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Pérez Villamonte

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Potosí, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1936Born
11 Jan 195922.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 199559.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sucre, Bolivia
16 Dec 199559.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Curubis
2 Feb 199659.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Curubis
7 Mar 199861.3AppointedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
25 Nov 200973.0ResignedBishop of Potosí, Bolivia
29 Mar 201881.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Potosí, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Walter Pérez Villamonte
Bishop Walter Pérez Villamonte (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Potosí

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVilacaya
Ordained BishopCathedral, Sucre, Archdiocese of Sucre
Death PlaceSucre, Archdiocese of Sucre

  • a priest for 59.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Nov 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,679
  • d: CB, 29 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast