Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Józef Wesołowski

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1948BornNowy Targ, Poland
21 May 197223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Kraków {Cracow}, Poland
3 Nov 199951.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Slebte
3 Nov 199951.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bolivia
6 Jan 200051.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Slebte
16 Feb 200253.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kazakhstan
16 Feb 200253.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Tadjikistan
6 Jul 200253.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Kyrgyzstan
6 Nov 200254.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Uzbekistan
24 Jan 200859.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
21 Aug 201365.0ResignedTitular Archbishop of Slebte
21 Aug 201365.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Dominican Republic
27 Jun 201465.9Laicized
28 Aug 201567.1DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Józef Wesołowski:
(Layman) Józef Wesołowski (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Dominican Republic

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jan 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,659
  • r: CB, 21 Aug 2013
  • laic: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2014
  • d: Bollettino, 28 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 28 Aug 2015