Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Victor Emilio Masalles Pere

Bishop of Baní, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1961 Born
7 Jul 199130.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 May 201048.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
8 May 201048.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Girba
29 Jun 201049.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Girba
14 Dec 201655.4AppointedBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic
11 Feb 201755.6InstalledBishop of Baní, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Victor Emilio Masalles Pere
Bishop Victor Emilio Masalles Pere (born ) Bishop of Baní

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarcelona, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Baní.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,751
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017