Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolás de Jesús Cardinal López Rodríguez

Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Cardinal-Priest of San Pio X alla Balduina

Bishop of Dominican Republic, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Oct 1936 BornBarranca
18 Mar 196124.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Vega, Dominican Republic
16 Jan 197841.2AppointedBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
25 Feb 197841.3Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco de Macorís, Dominican Republic
15 Nov 198145.0AppointedArchbishop of Santo Domingo, Dominican Republic
4 Apr 198245.4AppointedBishop of Dominican Republic, Military
28 Jun 199154.7Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199154.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pio X alla Balduina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás de Jesús López Rodríguez:
Cardinal Nicolás de Jesús López Rodríguez (born ) Archbishop of Santo Domingo

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Santo Domingo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 124
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 31 Oct 2013