Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Antonio Camilo González

Bishop of La Vega


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1938 BornSalcedo
1 Jul 196224.4Ordained PriestPriest of La Vega, Dominican Republic
10 Oct 199254.7AppointedBishop of La Vega, Dominican Republic
8 Dec 199254.8Ordained BishopBishop of La Vega, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Antonio Camilo González:
Bishop Gabriel Antonio Camilo González (born ) Bishop of La Vega

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of La Vega.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,991

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 Sep 2014