Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Tomás Alejo Concepción

Bishop-Elect of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1963 Born
7 Aug 199330.1Ordained PriestPriest of La Vega, Dominican Republic
7 Nov 202057.3AppointedBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic
16 Jan 202157.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Juan de la Maguana, Dominican Republic

MicroData Summary for Tomás Alejo Concepción
Father Tomás Alejo Concepción (born ) Bishop-Elect of San Juan de la Maguana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Ana, Villa Tapia, Diocese of La Vega
Ordained BishopSan Juan de la Maguana, Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2020
  • c1: CB, 7 Nov 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 18 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 19 Nov 2020

Quantcast