Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana

Dioecesis Sancti Ioannis Maguanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 November 1969
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Santo Domingo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Dominican Republic
  • Square Kilometers: 7,475 (2,887 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Obispado, Apartado 99, Calle San Juan Bautista 42, San Juan de la Maguana, Rep. Dominicana
  • Telephone: (809)557-2898
  • Fax: 557-4823

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of San Juan de la Maguana
25 September 1953ErectedArchdiocese of Santo Domingo Territorial Prelature of San Juan de la Maguana (erected)
Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana
19 November 1969ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of San Juan de la Maguana Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana
24 April 1976Territory LostDiocese of San Juan de la Maguana Diocese of Barahona (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of San Juan de la Maguana
1965530,000550,00096.4%12314312,325315116ap1967
Diocese of San Juan de la Maguana
1970545,000570,00095.6%12263814,342295119ap1971
1976651,000704,00092.5%6333916,692387022ap1977
1980391,000434,00090.1%5131821,72219348ap1981
1990420,000465,00090.3%9132219,090145714ap1991
1999516,000548,00094.2%13112421,500118225ap2000
2000524,000557,00094.1%13162918,068178026ap2001
2001450,000500,00090.0%20163612,500178829ap2002
2002450,000500,00090.0%18143214,0623158729ap2003
2003450,000500,00090.0%16143015,0005178729ap2004
2004450,000550,00081.8%18123015,0004138429ap2005
2010488,000596,00081.9%3083812,842489333ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013