Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Fouad Boutros Twal

Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1940 BornMadaba
29 Jun 196625.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 May 199251.6AppointedPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia
22 Jul 199251.7Ordained BishopPrelate of Tunis, Tunisia
31 May 199554.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Tunis, Tunisia
8 Sep 200564.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Jun 200867.6SucceededPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
24 Jun 201675.6RetiredPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Fouad Boutros Twal (VIAF: 261350064)
Patriarch Fouad Boutros Twal (born ) Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Please contact the Patriarch through the Patriarchate of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 8 Sep 2005
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,921
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 3 Oct 2016