Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Monterisi

Archpriest Emeritus of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}

Cardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1934 BornBarletta, Italy
16 Mar 195722.8Ordained PriestPriest of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
24 Dec 198248.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima
24 Dec 198248.6AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to Korea
6 Jan 198348.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Alba Maritima
20 Jun 198753.1AppointedOfficial of the Roman Curia - Other
11 Jun 199359.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bosnia-Herzegovina
7 Mar 199863.8AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Bishops
7 Mar 199863.8AppointedSecretary of the College of Cardinals
3 Jul 200975.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}
20 Nov 201076.5AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola
20 Nov 201076.5Elevated to Cardinal
12 Feb 201176.7InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Paolo alla Regola
23 Nov 201278.5RetiredArchpriest of the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}

MicroData Summary for Francesco Monterisi:
Cardinal Francesco Monterisi (born ) Archpriest Emeritus of Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}

Please contact the Cardinal through the Basilica di San Paolo fuori le Mura {Saint Paul Outside-the-Walls Basilica}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 18 Nov 2013