Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Mazzolari, M.C.C.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rumbek, South Sudan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Feb 1937Born
17 Mar 196225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
199052.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rumbek, South Sudan
5 Nov 199861.7AppointedBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan
6 Jan 199961.9Ordained BishopBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan
16 Jul 201174.4DiedBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Cesare Mazzolari
Bishop Cesare Mazzolari M.C.C.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Rumbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrescia, Diocese of Brescia, Italy

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 16 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Number 13,457
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast