Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Francis Buddy

Deceased

Bishop of San Diego, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1887Born
19 Sep 191426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA
31 Oct 193649.0AppointedBishop of San Diego, California, USA
21 Dec 193649.2Ordained BishopBishop of San Diego, California, USA
6 Mar 196678.4DiedBishop of San Diego, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Francis Buddy (VIAF: 4474474)
Bishop Charles Francis Buddy (born , died ) Bishop of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Joseph

  • a priest for 51.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Website of the Diocese, 12 Dec 2011
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast