Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Monaghan

Deceased

Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1890Born
29 May 191524.5Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 193645.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
17 Apr 193645.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Mela
29 Jun 193645.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mela
20 Mar 193948.3SucceededBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
13 Nov 194252.0DiedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Monaghan
Bishop Francis Joseph Monaghan (born , died ) Bishop of Ogdensburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNewark

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1936, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018