Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Henry McLaughlin

Deceased

Bishop of Paterson, New Jersey


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jul 1881BornNew York
26 Jul 190423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
18 May 193553.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
18 May 193553.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
25 Jul 193554.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nisa in Lycia
16 Dec 193756.4AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
17 Mar 194765.7DiedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Henry McLaughlin:
Bishop Thomas Henry McLaughlin (born , died ) Bishop of Paterson

  • a priest for 42.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1935, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013