Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Aloysius Duffy

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1884BornJersey City, NJ
13 Jun 190823.6Ordained PriestPriest
21 Apr 193348.4AppointedBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
29 Jun 193348.6Ordained BishopBishop of Syracuse, New York, USA
5 Jan 193752.1AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
14 Apr 193752.4InstalledBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
27 Sep 194459.9DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for John Aloysius Duffy:
Bishop John Aloysius Duffy (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1933, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015