Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Aloysius Griffin

Deceased

Bishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1883Born
4 Jul 190926.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 192340.7AppointedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
25 Feb 192440.9Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA
5 Aug 194865.4DiedBishop of Springfield in Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for James Aloysius Griffin
Bishop James Aloysius Griffin (born , died ) Bishop of Springfield in Illinois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChicago

  • a priest for 39.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1924, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast