Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ralph Leo Hayes

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa

Titular Bishop of Naraggara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1884BornPittsburgh
18 Sep 190925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
23 Jun 193348.8AppointedBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
21 Sep 193349.0Ordained BishopBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
5 Oct 193349.0InstalledBishop of Helena, Montana, USA
26 Oct 193551.1AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
26 Oct 193551.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Hieropolis
11 Nov 194460.1AppointedBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
11 Jan 194560.3InstalledBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
20 Oct 196682.1RetiredBishop of Davenport, Iowa, USA
20 Oct 196682.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Naraggara
4 Jul 197085.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Davenport, Iowa, USA

MicroData Summary for Ralph Leo Hayes:
Bishop Ralph Leo Hayes (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Davenport

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1933, Number 65
  • i/dave: Website of the Diocese, 18 Aug 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 11 Nov 2014