Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter William Curtis

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1913Born
8 Dec 193724.5Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Jun 195744.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
27 Jun 195744.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
24 Sep 195744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
23 Sep 196148.3AppointedBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
21 Nov 196148.5InstalledBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
28 Jun 198875.1RetiredBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
18 Oct 199784.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Walter William Curtis (VIAF: 3977584)
Bishop Walter William Curtis (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bridgeport

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJersey City, NJ
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast