Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Mortimer Fourette Smith

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1935Born
27 May 196125.9Ordained PriestPriest of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Nov 198752.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Newark, New Jersey, USA
20 Nov 198752.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
25 Jan 198852.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tres Tabernae
25 Jun 199156.0AppointedBishop of Pensacola-Tallahassee, Florida, USA
21 Nov 199560.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
30 Jun 199762.0SucceededBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
10 Sep 200166.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
19 Mar 200266.7CeasedApostolic Administrator of Metuchen, New Jersey, USA
1 Dec 201075.4RetiredBishop of Trenton, New Jersey, USA
22 Jan 201983.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Trenton, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for John Mortimer Fourette Smith
Bishop John Mortimer Fourette Smith (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Trenton

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrange, NJ
Ordained BishopSacred Heart, Cathedral, Newark, Archdiocese of Newark, New Jersey
Death PlaceMorris Hall Meadows, Lawrenceville, NJ, Diocese of Trenton, New Jersey

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,433
  • d/metu: CB, 22 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 23 Jan 2019

Quantcast