Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Terence James Cardinal Cooke

Deceased

Archbishop of New York, New York, USA

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Bishop of United States of America, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1921Born
1 Dec 194524.7Ordained PriestPriest of New York, New York, USA
15 Sep 196544.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
15 Sep 196544.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
13 Dec 196544.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
2 Mar 196847.0AppointedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA
4 Apr 196847.0AppointedBishop of United States of America, Military
28 Apr 196948.1Elevated to Cardinal
30 Apr 196948.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
6 Oct 198362.5DiedArchbishop of New York, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Terence James Cooke (VIAF: 89036598)
Terence James Cardinal Cooke (born , died ) Archbishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained PriestNew York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Death PlaceArchiepiscopal residence, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, St. Patrick, Cathedral, New York, Archdiocese of New York, New York

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
  • a cardinal for 14.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 27
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Apr 1969

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 16 Feb 2019

Quantcast