Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis John Mugavero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1914Born
18 May 194025.9Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Jul 196854.1AppointedBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
12 Sep 196854.2Ordained BishopBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
20 Feb 199075.6RetiredBishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
12 Jul 199177.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis John Mugavero (VIAF: 31540938)
Bishop Francis John Mugavero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained PriestBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Church, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • c1: CB, 9 Feb 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 14
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 3, Number 74

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 15 Feb 2019

Quantcast