Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anthony Joseph Cardinal Bevilacqua

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Cardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1923BornBrooklyn
11 Jun 194926.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198057.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
4 Oct 198057.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
24 Nov 198057.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Albae in Byzacena
10 Oct 198360.3AppointedBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Dec 198360.5InstalledBishop of Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Dec 198764.5AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Feb 198864.7InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
28 Jun 199168.0Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 199168.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santissimo Redentore e Sant’Alfonso in Via Merulana
15 Jul 200380.1RetiredArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
31 Jan 201288.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Anthony Joseph Bevilacqua:
Cardinal Anthony Joseph Bevilacqua (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 62.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • d: CB, 31 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013