Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Francis Martino

Bishop Emeritus of Scranton, Pennsylvania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1946 BornPhiladelphia
18 Dec 197024.6Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199649.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
24 Jan 199649.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
11 Mar 199649.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cellae in Mauretania
25 Jul 200357.2AppointedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
1 Oct 200357.4InstalledBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
31 Aug 200963.3ResignedBishop of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Francis Martino:
Bishop Joseph Francis Martino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Scranton

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Scranton.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 31 Aug 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144, Number 12,696
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013