Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph McIntyre

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Bononia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1963 BornPhiladelphia
16 May 199228.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 201046.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 201046.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Bononia
6 Aug 201047.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bononia

MicroData Summary for John Joseph McIntyre:
Bishop John Joseph McIntyre (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 203, Number 16,770

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013