Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Bruce Alan Lewandowski, C.Ss.R.

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Baltimore, Maryland, USA

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1967 Born
10 Sep 198821.2First VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
7 May 199426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
10 Jun 202053.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
10 Jun 202053.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
18 Aug 202053.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae

MicroData Summary for Bruce Alan Lewandowski
Father Bruce Alan Lewandowski C.Ss.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Baltimore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToledo, Diocese of Toledo (in America), Ohio
Ordained PriestShrine of the Immaculate Conception, Basilica, Washington, D.C., Archdiocese of Washington, District of Columbia
Ordained BishopMary Our Queen, Cathedral, Baltimore, Archdiocese of Baltimore, Maryland

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Baltimore.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jun 2020
  • mn/ob/c2: CB, 10 Jun 2020
  • c34: CB, 28 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Jul 2020

Quantcast