Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William George Curlin

Bishop Emeritus of Charlotte, North Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1927 BornPortsmouth, VA
25 May 195729.7Ordained PriestPriest of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
2 Nov 198861.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Washington, District of Columbia, USA
2 Nov 198861.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
20 Dec 198861.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rossmarkaeum
22 Feb 199466.5AppointedBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
13 Apr 199466.6InstalledBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA
10 Sep 200275.0RetiredBishop of Charlotte, North Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for William George Curlin:
Bishop William George Curlin (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Charlotte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Charlotte.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,929
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013