Catholic-Hierarchy DC

John Patrick Cardinal Foley

Deceased

Grand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

Cardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Nov 1935BornDarby, PA
23 Sep 196125.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
19 May 196226.5Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
5 Apr 198448.4AppointedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
5 Apr 198448.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
8 May 198448.5Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Neapolis in Proconsulari
2 Apr 200569.4CeasedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
21 Apr 200569.4ConfirmedPresident of the Pontifical Council for Social Communications
27 Jun 200771.6AppointedPro-Grand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
24 Nov 200772.0Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200772.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
27 Nov 200772.0InstalledCardinal-Deacon of San Sebastiano al Palatino
22 Dec 200772.1AppointedGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
29 Aug 201175.8RetiredGrand Master of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem
11 Dec 201176.1DiedGrand Master Emeritus of the Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Foley:
Cardinal John Patrick Foley (born , died ) Grand Master Emeritus of Equestrian Order of the Holy Sepulchre of Jerusalem

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Feb 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 29 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 144
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013