Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Edward Thomas

Bishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA

Apostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1959 Born
18 May 198525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200646.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200646.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Bardstown
26 Jul 200647.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bardstown
26 Aug 201455.2AppointedBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
22 Oct 201455.3InstalledBishop of Toledo (in America), Ohio, USA
28 Dec 201657.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Cleveland, Ohio, USA

MicroData Summary for Daniel Edward Thomas
Bishop Daniel Edward Thomas (born ) Bishop of Toledo (in America)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePhiladelphia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Toledo (in America).

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,214
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Aug 2014
  • i: CB, 26 Aug 2014
  • ab: CB, 28 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 28 Dec 2016