Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timothy Christian Senior

Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Titular Bishop of Floriana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Mar 1960 BornPhiladelphia, PA
18 May 198525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200949.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Jun 200949.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Floriana
31 Jul 200949.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Floriana

MicroData Summary for Timothy Christian Senior:
Bishop Timothy Christian Senior (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Philadelphia

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Philadelphia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,255

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013