Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Cleveland

Dioecesis Clevelandensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Richard Gerard Lennon, Bishop
  • Anthony Michael Pilla, Bishop Emeritus
  • Roger William Gries, O.S.B., Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Anthony Edward Pevec, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 23 April 1847
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Cincinnati
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Ohio
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 8,842 (3,414 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises eight Counties in the north-central part of the State of Ohio, namely Ashland, Cuyahoga, Geauga, Lake, Lorain, medina, Summit and Wayne Counties.
  • Conference Region: VI (OH, MI)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CLV
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofcleveland.org/
  • Mailing Address: Chancery Bldg., 1027 Superior Ave., Cleveland, OH 44114
  • Telephone: (216)696-6525
  • Fax: 621-7332

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
23 April 1847ErectedDiocese of Cincinnati Diocese of Cleveland (erected)
15 April 1910Territory LostDiocese of Cleveland Diocese of Toledo (erected)
15 May 1943Territory LostDiocese of Cleveland Diocese of Youngstown (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1950519,3362,170,24123.9%5221977197224162,867211ap1951
1966868,6672,754,82031.5%6333379708955833,428235ap1967
1970895,9573,079,36129.1%6102768861,0114693,068236ap1971
1976964,6233,004,83432.1%6202859051,06534262,770236ap1977
1980979,3002,758,33735.5%6452458901,100233952,516256ap1981
1990812,7042,830,10028.7%5641947581,0721112871,998250ap1991
1999827,9712,822,18029.3%4991436421,289168751,598235ap2000
2000822,9962,819,52329.2%4891516401,2851702251,547235ap2001
2001816,9122,818,71129.0%4881426301,2961742161,479235ap2002
2002820,1102,855,12928.7%4681446121,3401792051,413235ap2003
2003814,7912,852,33128.6%4641436071,3421821981,384234ap2004
2004812,6752,852,33128.5%4541496031,3471892081,325234ap2005
2006797,8982,852,02228.0%4281135411,4742001681,203233ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014