Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Ward

Deceased

Bishop of Leavenworth, Kansas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1857BornWest View, OH
17 Jul 188427.1Ordained PriestPriest of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
24 Nov 191053.5AppointedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
22 Feb 191153.7Ordained BishopBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA
20 Apr 192971.9DiedBishop of Leavenworth, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for John Ward:
Bishop John Ward (born , died ) Bishop of Leavenworth

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013