Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Crest: from the Official Web Site of the Archdiocese

Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas

Archidioecesis Kansanopolitana in Kansas



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Fred Naumann, Archbishop
  • James Patrick Keleher, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 9 August 1952
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Kansas
  • Country: United States of America
  • Square Kilometers: 32,437 (12,524 Square Miles)
  • Description: The Archdiocese is comprised of the following 21 counties of the State of Kansas: Anderson, Atchison, Brown, Coffey, Doniphan, Douglas, Franklin, Jackson, Jefferson, Johnson, Leavenworth, Linn, Lyon, Marshall, Miami, Nemaha, Osage, Pottawatomie, Shawnee, Wabaunsee and Wyandotte.
  • Conference Region: IX (IA, KS, MO, NE)
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: KCK
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archkck.org/
  • Archdiocesan Newspaper: http://www.theleaven.com/
  • Mailing Address: 12615 Parallel Parkway, Kansas City, KS 66109
  • Telephone: (913)721-1570
  • Fax: 721-1577

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains
19 July 1850ErectedDiocese of New Orleans Vicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains (erected)
6 January 1857Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains Vicariate Apostolic of Nebraska (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kansas
1857Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Indian Territory East of the Rocky Mountains Vicariate Apostolic of Kansas
Diocese of Leavenworth
22 May 1877ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kansas Diocese of Leavenworth (Name changed and Vicariate raised into a Diocese)
2 August 1887Territory LostDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Concordia (erected)
2 August 1887Territory LostDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Wichita (erected)
1 July 1897Territory LostDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Concordia (Counties of Washington, Clay, Riley, Geary, and Dickinson)
Diocese of Kansas City in Kansas
10 May 1947Name ChangedDiocese of Leavenworth Diocese of Kansas City in Kansas
Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas
9 August 1952ElevatedDiocese of Kansas City in Kansas Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Leavenworth
Diocese of Kansas City in Kansas
195080,000594,28913.5%1142113252464331,495133ap1951
Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas
1965135,000780,13717.3%1302513813543611,649127ap1967
1970137,500780,13717.6%1191392585321761,335103ap1971
1976138,500888,02815.6%12615628249121081599ap1977
1980151,114905,27116.7%1101312416271621,239101ap1981
1990175,520980,00017.9%101631641,0701285122ap1991
1999190,418952,00020.0%97751721,10723810119ap2000
2000190,826952,00020.0%100671671,14288765119ap2001
2001197,1901,174,50016.8%100661661,18782712119ap2002
2002197,7521,174,50016.8%95641591,24379677119ap2003
2003200,0121,193,42516.8%97571541,29872652119ap2004
2004191,2031,193,42516.0%101591601,19574644118ap2005
2005198,4251,205,00016.5%106551611,23273615118ap2006
2006200,0001,215,00016.5%103551581,26577588118ap2007
2007199,2461,193,42516.7%105621671,193384569116ap2008
2008203,7411,204,00016.9%108611691,205377542111ap2009
2009208,5001,289,90316.2%111581691,233373528111ap2010
2010210,1921,300,37316.2%114561701,236370510110ap2011
2011211,6001,310,95716.1%116551711,237567489110ap2012
2012213,0001,320,00016.1%115521671,2752264496108ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014