Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joseph Fred Naumann

Archbishop of Kansas City in Kansas

Apostolic Administrator of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1949 BornSaint Louis
24 May 197525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jul 199748.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Saint Louis, Missouri, USA
9 Jul 199748.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
3 Sep 199748.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caput Cilla
7 Jan 200454.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
19 Mar 200454.7InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
15 Jan 200555.6SucceededArchbishop of Kansas City in Kansas, USA
21 Apr 201565.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kansas City-Saint Joseph, Missouri, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Fred Naumann:
Archbishop Joseph Fred Naumann (born ) Archbishop of Kansas City in Kansas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kansas City in Kansas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 349
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Jul 1997
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jan 2004
  • s: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,043
  • c4: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: CB, 21 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015