Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carl Alan Kemme

Bishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1960 Born
10 May 198625.7Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Illinois, USA
20 Feb 201453.5AppointedBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA
1 May 201453.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wichita, Kansas, USA

MicroData Summary for Carl Alan Kemme
Bishop Carl Alan Kemme (born ) Bishop of Wichita

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEffingham, IL

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wichita.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob: CB, 20 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 6 Feb 2018